EURASIA EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith and the relief of poverty in Romania, Moldova, Central Asia other former Communist countries and peoples in Muslim lands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Moldova
- Nigeria
- Russia
Governance
- 12 August 1982: Standard registration
- ROMAF (Working name)
- THE ROMANIAN AID FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary James | Chair | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUNE ROSE GIBSON | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Jane George | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robson Lopes | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronald Alfred George | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.10k | £30.65k | £126.20k | £101.69k | £77.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.40k | £36.10k | £120.32k | £103.63k | £103.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/1982 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/11/2015 as amended on 04 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE SPREAD OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AND THAT INTERPRETATION OFTHEM USUALLY CALLED EVANGELICAL IN ROMANIA AND OTHER COUNTRIES OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM THE GOVERNMENT OF WHICH PURSUE ATHEISTIC AND/OR COMMUNIST POLICIES. (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHRISTIANS WHOSE NEED OR DEPRIVATION HAS BEEN CAUSED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY PERSECUTION FOR A REASON OR REASONS CONNECTED WITH HIS/HER OR THEIR RELIGION AND DEPENDENT OF SUCH CHRISTIANS.
Area of benefit
ROMANIA AND OTHER COUNTRIES OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOLZAR
GREEN LANE
CROWBOROUGH
TN6 2DE
- Phone:
- 01892663391
- Email:
- enquiries.dgu@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window