GRANGE FARM CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of the charity is to provide or to assist in the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure-time occupation for the benefit of the inhabitants of the London Metropolitan Police District and the District of Epping Forest, Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 September 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR NEIL JOHNSON | Chair | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
LEE SCOTT | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE BURROWS | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE METCALFE | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAVED SALIM | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Henry Morgan | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY SARTIN | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER BENEDICT MINOLETTI | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM CHURCH | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £466.12k | £516.72k | £466.61k | £488.61k | £470.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £620.34k | £572.23k | £752.22k | £669.54k | £697.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £486.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £572.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £504.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £67.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 25TH SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN POLICE DISTRICT AND EPPING FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
181 HIGH STREET
EPPING
CM16 4BQ
- Phone:
- 01992578642
- Email:
- info@grangefarmcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window