Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION FOR VETERINARY CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS

Charity number: 285173
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 16 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 23 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required