THE OPEN UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give grants for course fees and essential study costs to OU students who are in financial difficulty and unable to receive financial assistance from government and university sources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 August 1982: Standard registration
- OUSET (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jones | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Robinson | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon O'Kelly | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Smith | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia McDougall | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bryan | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beth Pacey | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.64k | £121.56k | £492.47k | £811.30k | £198.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.45k | £179.38k | £323.48k | £134.49k | £296.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £795.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £659.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £134.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND MAY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 9TH OCTOBER 1992 as amended on 09 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ASSISTING OPEN UNIVERSITY STUDENTS WHO ARE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED OR IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF AIDS, GRANTS, LOANS OR OTHER MEANS THAT SHALL ASSIST THEIR EDUCATION WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OUSET
Walton Hall
Walton Hall
Milton Keynes
MK7 6BE
- Phone:
- 01908652026
- Email:
- ouset@open.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window