WARMINSTER SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fund raising through various social events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 August 1982: Standard registration
- WARMINSTER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Alison Margaret Kennedy | Chair | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Garcia-White | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Annabella Bevan | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aleece Nicole Hoelscher | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Gibson | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Webber | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Cook | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Morgan-Nash | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lale Brown | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Frances Hall | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Hunnibell | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Victoria Sharpe | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Saunders | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.48k | £54.68k | £47.72k | £66.22k | £77.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.77k | £64.79k | £42.55k | £42.71k | £65.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 02/07/1982 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 APR 2019 as amended on 14 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION IN THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE GOVERNORS
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARMINSTER SCHOOL
CHURCH STREET
WARMINSTER
BA12 8PJ
- Phone:
- 01985 210159
- Email:
- wspa@warminsterschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window