Financial history KENSAL GREEN UNDER FIVES GROUP

Charity Number: 285210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £191.14k £222.55k £178.28k £188.11k £209.42k
Total expenditure £217.47k £208.96k £198.48k £171.69k £208.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £66.73k £91.28k £79.52k £83.05k £118.07k