OXFORD DIOCESAN COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL WORK INCORPORATED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main areas of activity are in adoption work and community projects such as Alana House for those within the criminal justice system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,604,726
Donations and legacies | £224.28k | |
Charitable activities | £4.34m | |
Other trading activities | £21.54k | |
Investments | £20.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,606,341
Raising funds | £214.79k | |
Charitable activities | £4.39m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,793 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,431,050 from 120 government contract(s) and £680,413 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £214.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.39m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £214.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.39m | |
Retained for future use | £3.18k |
People

90 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 November 2002: Standard registration
- PACT (PARENTS AND CHILDREN TOGETHER) (Working name)
- PARENTS AND CHILDREN TOGETHER (PACT) (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Ann Jones | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Camburn | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Marguerite Anne Elliott | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Roper | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Villa-Clarke | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Margaret Foote | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Sangita Manek | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rene Mary Baron | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Hunter | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judith Elizabeth Sumner | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edgars Smatovs | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Cuell | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.15m | £4.26m | £4.33m | £4.25m | £4.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.56m | £3.78m | £4.21m | £4.55m | £4.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £573.21k | £3.43m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £254.57k | £457.33k | £241.24k | £680.41k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £147.78k | £422.50k | £543.18k | £459.95k | £224.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £16.50k | £6.68k | £13.33k | £38.22k | £21.54k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.98m | £3.83m | £3.77m | £3.75m | £4.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.45k | £3.06k | £2.09k | £7.70k | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £3.37k | £67.50k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.45m | £3.65m | £4.05m | £4.37m | £4.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £118.68k | £131.05k | £165.36k | £180.81k | £214.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £106.85k | £189.69k | £123.27k | £135.38k | £217.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.21m | £1.92m | £1.90m | £1.85m | £1.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £41.33k | £49.89k | £54.23k | £52.18k | £56.97k | |
|
Other assets | £1.87m | £2.60m | £2.83m | £2.59m | £3.00m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.22m | -£3.63m | -£3.03m | -£802.00k | -£484.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £566.33k | £764.13k | £710.01k | £609.79k | £988.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH MAY 1982 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1984, 25 JANUARY 2005, 19 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 18 DECEMBER 2009 NULL AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELLBEING OF PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM; TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND WELFARE OF ADOPTED CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AN APPROVED ADOPTION SERVICE AND FACILITATING THEIR ADOPTION BY SUITABLE PERSONS; THE PROVISION OF RELIEF AND SUPPORT TO CHILDREN IN NEED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE OR DISADVANTAGED WOMEN AND GIRLS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Linked charities
- 20 November 2002 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Southern Court
South Street
READING
Berkshire
RG1 4QS
- Phone:
- 01189381700
- Email:
- info@pactcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window