Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S, COLYTON
Charity Number: 285239

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ros Yarlott | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ellen Anning | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niall Mc Neice | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Makemson | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Franklin | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Preece | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fouracre | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ford | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Kay White | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER LAUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.