STEYNING GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities for the purpose of educating young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 September 1982: Standard registration
- 25 May 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 04 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 23 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 03 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 08 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
STEYNING GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window