NORTH LONDON HOSPICE

Charity Number: 285300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of specialist palliative care in inpatient, day care in health and wellbeing centre and community settings. Education and training of healthcare professionals and partnerships with other organisations that share our objects also form an important part of our work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Enfield
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NORTH LONDON HOSPICE GROUP (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hayley Michelle Pannick Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Dr Suzanne Lea Joels Trustee 10 September 2024
THE JESSICA JOELS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SUZANNE JOELS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE NORMAN JOELS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Samuel Marc Shaerf Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Marsha La-Toya Tamara Jones Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Samantha Emily Durling Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Robert Benjamin Tobin Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Dr Ujjal SARKAR Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Saurabh KHARE Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Anna BOKOBZA Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Andrew Jonathan Harris Trustee 23 February 2021
None on record
Dr Catherine Woodwark Trustee 28 April 2020
None on record
Simon Males Trustee 24 March 2020
None on record
Henry Thomas Fairfax Easterling Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Beverley Jane Taylor Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
JOHN REID Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record
SIMON MORRIS Trustee 28 December 2012
ALZHEIMER'S FOUNDATION FOR RESEARCH INTO ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE.
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.07m £17.07m £14.97m £12.08m £15.31m
Total expenditure £12.66m £12.89m £13.47m £14.54m £15.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.87m £8.47m £5.84m £5.02m £5.38m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.88m £5.90m £5.27m £2.96m £5.56m
Income - Other trading activities £2.68m £1.37m £3.41m £3.53m £3.90m
Income - Charitable activities £5.17m £8.78m £5.94m £5.21m £5.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £299.57k £229.93k £242.33k £318.95k £395.25k
Income - Other £31.14k £795.22k £97.65k £59.45k £66.12k
Income - Legacies £3.25m £4.14m £2.47m £1.25m £2.31m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.79m £10.05m £10.24m £10.89m £11.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.83m £2.82m £3.09m £3.43m £3.91m
Expenditure - Governance £18.03k £19.31k £22.00k £26.69k £28.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £50.06k £51.20k £58.32k £55.47k £60.34k
Expenditure - Other £36.80k £21.10k £130.52k £214.43k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £7.98m £7.83m £7.58m £8.19m £8.20m
Long-term investments £11.37m £13.91m £15.27m £15.05m £16.73m
Other assets £5.27m £8.65m £10.10m £7.15m £6.20m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.47m £2.75m £2.68m £3.10m £2.22m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED MADE 1ST APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 APR 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING BY THE MAINTENANCE OF NORTH LONDON HOSPICE FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CHRONIC OR TERMINAL DISEASE AND IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL THE OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR WHICH NORTH LONDON HOSPICE GROUP (A REGISTERED CHARITY) WAS ESTABLISHED.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Registration history
  • 19 August 1998 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
NORTH LONDON HOSPICE
47 WOODSIDE AVENUE
LONDON
N12 8TT
Phone:
0208 343 6802