CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT WORK

Charity number: 285337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Practical help and advice to families. Providing monetary support for purchase of necessities. Working in partnership with voluntary and statutory organisations. Employing full time and part time support workers to work with families, individually or in groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 1982: Standard registration
  • 09 November 2018: Funds received from 1058601 CRAWLEY FURNI-AID
  • 30 April 2020: Funds received from 235844 CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT...
  • 06 October 2022: Funds received from 235849 THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUP...
  • 12 November 2024: Funds received from 235855 THE BELL HOSTEL TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EDWARD RICHARD BICKERSTETH Chair 25 July 2024
FRIENDS OF ASHBURNHAM AND PENHURST CHURCHES
Received: On time
THE ASHBURNHAM THANKSGIVING TRUST
Received: On time
Mary Elizabeth Symes Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Lady Serena Soames Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Revd Canon Andrew John Woodward Trustee 25 July 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KEMP TOWN: SAINT MARY
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Lee Clark Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Rev David John King Trustee 30 November 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BALCOMBE
Received: On time
GILLIAN SIGGS Trustee 30 November 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EASTBOURNE
Received: On time
Dr Janet Baah Trustee 18 January 2023
LEWES EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
Dr Timothy John Charles Fooks Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Sharon Philips Trustee 19 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £781.87k £998.60k £688.64k £941.76k £1.11m
Total expenditure £897.80k £844.97k £825.11k £999.96k £1.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.53k £125.93k £6.90k £8.20k £35.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £519.03k £795.87k £447.35k £646.87k £774.62k
Income - Other trading activities £80.62k £38.66k £70.59k £80.76k £86.50k
Income - Charitable activities £123.30k £103.88k £108.39k £144.72k £173.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £58.93k £60.06k £62.31k £69.90k £74.99k
Income - Other £0 £130 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £177.66k £17.38k £6.51k £49.45k £2.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £713.36k £671.42k £668.52k £832.50k £948.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £124.85k £173.55k £156.59k £167.46k £189.42k
Expenditure - Governance £1.35k £2.64k £0 £15.78k £30.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £15.37k £2.38k £2.52k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £59.59k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £296.68k £302.36k £300.27k £295.52k £294.13k
Long-term investments £1.27m £1.33m £1.35m £1.34m £1.53m
Other assets £230.10k £375.83k £245.21k £175.74k £131.43k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £28.14k £25.91k £29.67k £22.24k £155.91k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Garton House
22 Stanford Avenue
BRIGHTON
BN1 6AA
Phone:
01273832963