THE GM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 285342
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making trust for Bradford area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 20 September 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 1982: Standard registration
  • 18 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/09/2013 20/09/2014 20/09/2015 20/09/2016 20/09/2017
Total gross income £628 £1.20k £700 £700 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £700 £700 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 20 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 20 September 2017 17 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 September 2016 17 November 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2016 Not Required