ISCA CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian faith in furtherance of religious education, Christian training and knowledge and other objects of a charitable nature connected with the Christian gospel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 15 September 1982: Standard registration
- 20 March 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1195785 ISCA CHURCH
- ISCA CHURCH (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.71k | £215.49k | £312.86k | £243.18k | £225.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.93k | £214.28k | £198.98k | £209.91k | £187.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MARCH 1982 AND DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 1 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED DEED OF RETIREMENT 1 JULY 2001, ORDER 23 JULY 2002, DEED OF APPOINTMENT 20 AUGUST 2003 AND DEED OF VARIATION 9 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CHRISTIAN TRAINING AND KNOWLEDGE AND OTHER OBJECTS OF A CHARITABLE NATURE CONNECTED WITH THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window