FD-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support children and young adults suffering from Familial Dysautonomia. We pay for physio and therapy and medicine not available under the NHS, financial help for the families who need respite care. Assist with travel to USA FD centre for assessment and treatment. We update sufferers and families with information of research and treatments and information about genetic testing .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 1982: Standard registration
- 22 May 2024: Funds received from 1070222 EASY-ACCESS JEWISH HELPLINK
- THE DYSAUTONOMIA SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan King | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Landau | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Landau | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.70k | £21.21k | £20.80k | £18.10k | £21.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.35k | £28.36k | £27.21k | £28.80k | £35.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 December 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2021 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2021 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/08/1982 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISORDER IN PARTICULAR DYSAUTONOMIA. THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES TREATMENT ELEVATION AND CURE OF SUCH DISORDERS IN PARTICULAR DYSAUTONOMIA PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH OF STUDIES ARE DISSEMINATED AMONG THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 SOMALI ROAD
LONDON
NW2 3RN
- Phone:
- 02074350243
- Email:
- sarah.landau15@gmail.com
- Website:
-
fd-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window