2ND HISTON GUIDE COMPANY

Charity number: 285405
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007

Total income: £119,700
Total expenditure: £125,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 1982: Standard registration
  • 18 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • HISTON ACTION PLUS (Working name)
  • HISTON ACTION PLUS GUIDES (Working name)
  • 1ST AND 2ND HISTON GUIDE COMPANY (Previous name)
  • 2ND AND 3RD HISTON GUIDE COMPANY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2004 31/01/2005 31/01/2006 31/12/2007
Total gross income £1.75k £1.52k £889 £119.70k
Total expenditure £1.99k £1.78k £1.71k £125.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 03 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted