THE SCEAUX GARDENS TENANTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for training, education for parents and children on Sceaux Gardens Estate. Social events and programmes throughout the year for children and families. Advice and information on housing and related issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
Governance
- 05 October 1982: Standard registration
- SCEAUX GARDENS TA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MCGRATH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Jessiman | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Edge | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.49k | £7.03k | £6.69k | £35.56k | £21.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.18k | £6.47k | £9.32k | £17.84k | £21.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.54k | £4.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 293 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2024 | 658 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2024 | 1023 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2024 | 1388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH AUGUST 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS MAKING USE OF THESE FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 29
Voltaire
Sceaux Gardens
LONDON
SE5 7DD
- Phone:
- 07582385770
- Email:
- sgtrasec0@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window