THE BASOTHO EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of school/college fees to enable needy Basotho people to undertake vocational training thereby enhancing their life and economic prospects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lesotho
Governance
- 10 July 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIPPA BIRD TSSF | Chair | 12 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
Kekeletso 'Malipalo Kuena Mokete | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Claydon | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sister Monica Williams CHN | Trustee | 01 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME SHAW | Trustee | 01 March 1994 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBECCA CHANDLER-WILDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.84k | £18.78k | £16.38k | £17.39k | £11.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.37k | £11.51k | £21.24k | £10.36k | £17.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JULY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TECHNICAL TRAINING BY GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE TO BASOTHO OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
LESOTHO
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 RIDLEY AVENUE
LONDON
W13 9XW
- Phone:
- 02089321518
- Email:
- psbird@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window