The John Gurney Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants for the benefit of art,culture, sport, recreation for the inhabitants of the designated area of the charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 October 1982: Standard registration
- JOHN GURNEY'S CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRISCILLA ANN MEATH BAKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William John Clovis Meath Baker | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS COURTAULD | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|||||
BRUCE SHERIDAN CHRISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.00k | £143.37k | £151.89k | £164.31k | £181.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.64k | £304.95k | £170.51k | £139.07k | £399.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JUL 1982 AS AMENDED ON 24 APR 2023
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESERVE IMPROVE AND ALSO RENEW WHERE ESSENTIAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF WALSINHAM, SPROWSTON AND ADJOINING AREAS IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE AFOREMENTIONED AREAS IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTITUTIONAL INTEREST. B) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE BUILDINGS IN THE PARISHES OF WALSINGHAM, SPROWSTON AND ADJOINING AREAS AFORESAID PROVIDING SPECIAL FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF THE PUBLIC WHICH ARE NOT PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND IN PARTICULAR THE PARISH HALL IN LITTLE WALSINGHAM AND SIMILARLY TO PRESERVE IMPROVE AND RENEW THE CONTENTS OF SUCH BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WALSINGHAM, SPROWSTON AND ADJOINING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Estate Office
10 Common Place
WALSINGHAM
Norfolk
NR22 6BP
- Phone:
- 01328820259
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window