THE HENBURY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education of the students of Henbury School, Bristol by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school being primarily but not exclusively facilities not normally provided by the academy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 15 September 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLE CERULLO | Chair | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE HANCOCK | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|||||
David Biddel | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|||||
KAREN DOUGLAS | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.10k | £7.59k | £6.94k | £7.56k | £8.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £2.00k | £2.05k | £2.90k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JULY 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS FROM TIME TO TIME AT HENBURY SCHOOL, MARISSAL ROAD, HENBURY, BRISTOL BY PROVIDING EXTRA FACILITIES AND TO FOSTER MORE CONTACTS BETWEEN THE SCHOOL STAFF AND PARENTS OF PUPILS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blaise High School
Station Road
Henbury
BRISTOL
BS10 7QH
- Phone:
- 0117 9030100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window