Financial history DITTISHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 285469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £120.66k £80.03k £31.75k £18.13k £18.04k
Total expenditure £23.04k £203.08k £19.47k £17.80k £19.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £10.00k N/A £3.00k £3.00k