ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST LONDON AND HAVERING BRANCH

Charity number: 285472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help with educating people in the correct treatment of animals. Including neutering and providing shelter, veterinary treatment when necessary and boarding unwanted animals till new homes are found.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £39,725
Total expenditure: £76,510

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 1982: Standard registration
  • 08 February 2024: Funds received from 240507 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA LONDON EAST BRANCH (Working name)
  • ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LONDON EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA LONDON EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Candy Bowles Chair 25 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST LONDON AND HAVERING BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Ranjini Sachin Trustee 09 September 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST LONDON AND HAVERING BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Wai Chung Cheung Trustee 09 September 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST LONDON AND HAVERING BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Joanne Skolnick Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Anjalika Bardalai Trustee 02 June 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST LONDON AND HAVERING BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Caroline Nurse Trustee 21 September 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST LONDON AND HAVERING BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Natalie Chopra Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £98.84k £49.35k £44.84k £60.91k £39.73k
Total expenditure £74.37k £42.98k £38.68k £73.92k £76.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RSPCA London East Branch
124
City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
Phone:
07876753228