Accounts and annual returns STUDLEY GREEN (TROWBRIDGE) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 285503
Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required