Trustees THE WEALD SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 285569

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Williamson | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Victor | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Jordan | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Howard | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Edwards | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Terry | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ashcroft | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.