Financial history PRESTON CANDOVER VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 285581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £21.50k £10.14k £7.98k £11.10k £10.73k
Total expenditure £10.31k £5.84k £9.64k £15.94k £21.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A