THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 285583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity organises events & activities in order to raise funds to advance the education of the pupils of the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school (not normally provided by the local education authority). These activities include Christmas Fayres, Summer Events, School Disco's, Sales of Cakes and ice creams.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 October 2024

Total income: £33,540
Total expenditure: £15,040

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • F O S M (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Louise Muegge Chair 03 October 2024
None on record
Joanna Manka Trustee 02 March 2023
None on record
Justyna Duffy-Turner Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023 01/10/2024
Total gross income £8.18k £1.05k £1.05k £9.38k £33.54k
Total expenditure £2.25k £4.68k £4.68k £5.65k £15.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £200

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2024 04 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 October 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2021 30 November 2022 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Friends Of St Mary's RC Primary
School Association
St. Marys Rc Primary School
Cheltenham Road East
GLOUCESTER
GL3 1HU
Phone:
01452714053
Website:

No information available