SOUTHILL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 285587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides housing for the elderly.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £23,391
Total expenditure: £16,147

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Barber-Lomax Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Whitbread Trustee 13 December 2021
WATERBERG WELFARE SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROWNEY TRUST
Received: On time
SCHOOLREADERS
Received: On time
MRS JANE CART'S TRUST
Received: On time
LADY WHITBREAD Trustee
None on record
CHARLES EDWARD SAMUEL WHITBREAD Trustee
Wild Life Foundation
Received: On time
GILCHRIST EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE WIXAMTREE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROWNEY TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ELSTOW ABBEY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.25k £24.67k £23.85k £22.56k £23.39k
Total expenditure £19.77k £17.50k £16.03k £20.32k £16.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ESTATE OFFICE
SOUTHILL PARK
BIGGLESWADE
BEDS
SG18 9LJ
Phone:
01462813209
Website:

No information available