Financial history THE SEVENOAKS PLAYERS

Charity number: 285591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £42.02k £0 £3.55k £29.68k £41.47k
Total expenditure £42.12k £2.57k £2.14k £32.24k £44.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A