Financial history 1ST ALDWICK AND PAGHAM SEASCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 285692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.29k £2.88k £854 £575 £3.17k
Total expenditure £16.54k £4.80k £3.96k £0 £8.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 N/A N/A N/A N/A