Financial history JOHN HANSON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 285701
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009
Total gross income £5.30k £5.64k £6.58k £6.63k £7.81k
Total expenditure £2.04k £11.83k £3.11k £14.64k £8.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A