SOUTH WIMBLEDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a facility promoting social well-being, catering predominantly for the local South Wimbledon community.We also have users from further afield. We provide rooms & other facilities at lower rates than most other local providers. We also provide limited direct services for members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,130 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Merton
Governance
- 06 December 1982: Standard registration
- SOUTH WIMBLEDON COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Thomas Lake | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Congrave | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Brunt | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Heppell | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Norman Harold Coles | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harry Joseph Todd | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR Bert Kennedy | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
June Margaret Hayles | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS Philomena Kennedy | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
THANABALASINGAM RATNAVADIEVEL | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE UNA COWPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.11k | £61.45k | £56.35k | £76.50k | £72.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.39k | £78.31k | £67.73k | £69.24k | £84.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.74k | £22.95k | £17.91k | £6.07k | £3.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH MAY 1982 AND AMENDED 8TH NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 19 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SOUTH WIMBLEDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRES AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRES FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WIMBLEDON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 FERNLEIGH
23 Edith Road
Wimbledon
LONDON
SW19 8UD
- Phone:
- 02085435017
- Email:
- andy.coles53@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window