Trustees SOUTH WIMBLEDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 285705

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Thomas Lake | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Congrave | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Brunt | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Heppell | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Norman Harold Coles | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harry Joseph Todd | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR Bert Kennedy | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
June Margaret Hayles | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS Philomena Kennedy | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
THANABALASINGAM RATNAVADIEVEL | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE UNA COWPER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.