BRENTWOOD THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide drama and dance facilities for local amateur drama groups and for local groups with learning or physical disabilities. Also facilities for professional touring companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 25 November 1982: Standard registration
- BRENTWOOD THEATRE (Working name)
- BRENTWOOD THEATRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hawkins | Chair | 17 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Keren Elisabeth Cooke | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elliss | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bond | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joscelin Michael John Hollington | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Tom Stevens | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Hollington | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Southgate | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ABBOTT | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM WELLS | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.84k | £52.08k | £120.07k | £115.04k | £169.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.19k | £50.65k | £112.96k | £135.69k | £151.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.99k | £14.59k | £1.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4THE OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE DISTRICT OF BRENTWOOD PARTICULARLY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A THEATRE AND BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCUDING THE ARTS FO DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
BRENTWOOD DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brentwood Theatre
The Hermitage
15 Shenfield Road
BRENTWOOD
CM15 8AG
- Phone:
- 01277200305
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window