Financial history HOATH PARISH HALL

Charity number: 285718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £8.80k £2.40k £8.10k £14.58k £17.86k
Total expenditure £6.86k £2.22k £5.07k £9.97k £13.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A