WHIPPS CROSS HOSPITAL RADIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a local broadcasting service for Whipps Cross staff and patients within the hospital itself and within the wider community. The service provides round the clock entertainment, music, news, local sport, community and health information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 09 November 1982: Standard registration
- 09 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1180476 BEDROCK RADIO
- 09 March 2023: Funds transferred to 277847 RADIO FOREST HOSPITAL RADIO
- 09 March 2023: Funds transferred to 264132 HOSPITAL RADIO HILLINGDON
- 09 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1000953 BARTS RADIO
- 09 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1161203 RADIO HARROW
- 09 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1163315 HOSPITAL RADIO CHELMSFORD
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £2.42k | £1.27k | £239 | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £4.57k | £2.52k | £1.72k | £1.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/10/1982 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/1983 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN EAST LONDON BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window