Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HELSTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 285734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £19.79k £11.10k £7.04k £9.25k £13.96k
Total expenditure £8.28k £9.15k £11.70k £15.90k £12.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A