THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HELSTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to provide additional equipment for our hospital - over and above that supplied by the NHS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 December 1981: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HELSTON HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE HEATHER GILBERT | Chair | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE KATHLEEN PARISH | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE TOY | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY GRATTAN-KANE | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANN MITCHELL | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARIA JAMES | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN NELSON | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN ROBINSON | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS MEG WHERRY | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA FAITH DIXON | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNY MANN | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN JEANNETTE FERRIS | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO COWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE JANE RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE ATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PENNY TRUSCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY EILEEN WALLIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS SANDY BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY MICHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.79k | £11.10k | £7.04k | £9.25k | £13.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.28k | £9.15k | £11.70k | £15.90k | £12.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2011 as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE LEAGUE SHALL BE TO RELIEVE THE PATIENTS OF HELSTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED , HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHY-AN-VRE
17 Gwealhellis Warren
HELSTON
TR13 8PQ
- Phone:
- 01326 561464
- Email:
- info@helstonhospital.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window