Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HELSTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Charity number: 285734

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE HEATHER GILBERT | Chair | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE KATHLEEN PARISH | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE TOY | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY GRATTAN-KANE | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANN MITCHELL | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARIA JAMES | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN NELSON | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN ROBINSON | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS MEG WHERRY | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA FAITH DIXON | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNY MANN | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN JEANNETTE FERRIS | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO COWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE JANE RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE ATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PENNY TRUSCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY EILEEN WALLIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS SANDY BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY MICHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.