STAR CENTRE (HOUNSLOW)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 21 December 1982: Standard registration
- 20 November 1998: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 November 1998: Funds transferred to 1066570 THE STAR CENTRE (HOUNSLOW) LIMITED
- DROP IN - RETURN TO WORK (Working name)
- STAR WALK IN CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH OCTOBER 1982 AS AMENDED 8TH MARCH 1983, 5TH MARCH 1985 AND 4TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL PERSONS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESSES WHICH DO NOT REQUIRE HOSPITALISATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A CENTRE PROVIDING:- (A) ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID; AND (B) FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.