CATS IN CARE

Charity number: 285745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The rescue and homing of unwanted and abandoned cats and kittens

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £48,865
Total expenditure: £46,608

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CIC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Gwendoline Pickernell Mrs Chair 23 September 2021
None on record
Margaret Best Trustee 16 September 2022
None on record
Elaine Mayne Trustee 16 September 2022
None on record
Linda Webb Mrs Trustee 16 September 2022
None on record
Joan Bevan Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record
INES JACQUELINE CRUCEFIX Trustee
None on record
Lesley Alford Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.13k £57.12k £83.64k £509.68k £48.87k
Total expenditure £23.48k £27.91k £104.36k £37.72k £46.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £487.73k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £21.96k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £483.49k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £37.72k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £732 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 REDLAND LANE
WESTBURY
BA13 3QA
Phone:
01373826327
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available