DRAYTON PARSLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 285750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall - The Greenacre Hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,497
Total expenditure: £25,661

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GREENACRE HALL (Working name)
  • DRAYTON PARSLOW VILLAGE HALL (KNOWN AS THE CARRINGTON HALL) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR RICHARD WEMYSS Trustee
THE ROGER AND JEAN JEFCOATE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN PRESTON Trustee
None on record
SUSAN SYLVIA PIDDOCK Trustee
None on record
CAROL ELIZABETH WEMYSS Trustee
None on record
WENDY EILEEN PRESTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.74k £24.00k £16.48k £10.85k £16.50k
Total expenditure £18.78k £13.78k £20.03k £18.98k £25.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.10k £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Main Road
Drayton Parslow
Milton Keynes
MK17 0JS
Phone:
01296720741
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available