Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM AND ELLEN VINTEN TRUST

Charity Number: 285758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 February 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 February 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window