Governing document THE WILLIAM AND ELLEN VINTEN TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1988, 5TH MAY 1999 AND 1ST NOVEMBER 2005 as amended on 20 Apr 2012 as amended on 26 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
(A) (I) FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF OR (II) THE RELIEF OF AGE INFIRMITY AND POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE EMPLOYEES OF OR HAVE CONTRACTS OF SERVICE WITH OR WHO ARE APPRENTICED TO INDUSTRIAL FIRMS AND COMPANIES. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF INDUSTRIAL TRAINING OF THE BENEFICIARIES BY PROMOTING RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AS PART OF EDUCATION. (C) FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURETIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT FOR IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (D) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE PUBLIC ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.