Accounts and annual returns THE SILVANUS TRUST

Charity Number: 285768
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 22 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 12 January 2015 On Time