Financial history CAMBRIDGE SIKH SOCIETY

Charity number: 285789
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £4.18k £4.44k £5.05k £4.86k £6.64k
Total expenditure £1.81k £1.81k £2.00k £2.15k £3.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A