THE TURKISH CYPRIOT CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist the elderly, releif of poverty, sickness and distress and advancement of education amongst the Turkish Cypriot Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,580 from 1 government contract(s) and £6,580 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 19 November 1982: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TURKER CHAKICI | Chair |
|
||||||||
ERDIL ATAMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Halil Salih | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ABDULLAH HALISDEMIR | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
Mesut Hussein | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.31k | £58.12k | £38.45k | £56.64k | £16.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.29k | £44.05k | £52.96k | £47.23k | £36.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £13.67k | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £6.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.04k | £22.09k | £10.00k | £6.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 416 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
20 May 2022 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 22ND MARCH 1984
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE TURKISH CYPRIOT COMMUNITY IN LONDON WITH SPECIFIC REFERENCES TO THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE SAID COMMUNITY AND BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR SUCH MEMBERS OF THE SAID COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
14A GRAHAM ROAD
LONDON
E8 1BZ
- Phone:
- 02072497410
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window