Accounts and annual returns THE CANTERBURY URBAN STUDIES CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 285823
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 February 2007 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 29 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 29 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 07 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 07 December 2004 On Time