THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S, IFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of St Margaret's hold two or three small fundraising activities each year - mainly for the congregation and their friends and families. The profits are banked until such time as a need for funds arises in order for the church to improve or maintain facilities. The PCC applies to the Friends who consider giving a grant in these circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 20 December 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS RALPH EDWARD MISKIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Linda Bodiam | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PEERS CARTER | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carter | Trustee | 20 January 1996 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET FLINT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS EDESON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22k | £380 | £1.18k | £1.09k | £702 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 January 2022 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
THE UPKEEP, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC, FITTINGS, FURNITURE AND FIXTURES OF ST. MARGARET'S CHURCH AT IFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF KENT, THE MAINTENANCE OF DIVINE SERVICE THEREIN, THE UPKEEP OF THE CHURCHYARD AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF IFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYDON CROSS
DALE ROAD
SOUTHFLEET
GRAVESEND
DA13 9NX
- Phone:
- 01474833240
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window