THE ALBEMARLE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for and promoting the interests of disabled and disadvantaged persons generally from within Taunton Deane. THis provision includes supported housing, community access scheme, day care for elderly, physically disabled and people with learning and mental health problems, catering, childcare, and social activities and training at The Albemarle Centre Taunton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £119,171 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 January 1983: Standard registration
- THE ALBEMARLE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TIM WALKER | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Sarah Richards | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Louise Dobson | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Hobbs | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lisa Brown | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Clare Mellor | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anthony John Alderman | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £429.00k | £352.64k | £409.09k | £418.00k | £438.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £470.64k | £330.25k | £363.31k | £419.11k | £477.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £105.47k | £80.27k | £81.98k | £90.43k | £119.17k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.70k | £29.01k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH OCTOBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 1ST NOVEMBER 1982 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 10TH JANUARY 1994.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS AND ELDERLY PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Albemarle Centre
Albemarle Road
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 1BA
- Phone:
- 01823 252945
- Email:
- bookings@alblifeskills.org
- Website:
-
alblifeskills.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window