Financial history FRIENDS OF HETHERSETT ACADEMY

Charity number: 285898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.82k £1.18k £2.04k £4.43k £6.12k
Total expenditure £1.14k £3.12k £392 £3.35k £973
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A