THE NATIONAL SCHOOL SAILING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NSSA promotes sailing as part of the educational experience of young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 December 1982: Standard registration
- N S S A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven James Parkinson-Lloyd | Chair | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Victoria Blondell | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Sweet | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Alasdair Tarrant Conway | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | £4.23k | £22.26k | £21.68k | £20.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.92k | £4.23k | £16.57k | £20.10k | £16.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 March 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1961 AS AMENDED JANUARY 1979, 27 SEPTEMBER 1982,26 JULY 2006 AND 25 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE ALL YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM TO LEARN AND UNDERTAKE SAILING AND ALLIED ACTIVITIES AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Weir Cottage Close
Eaton Ford
ST. NEOTS
Cambridgeshire
PE19 7SH
- Phone:
- 01480531201
- Email:
- secretary@NSSA.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window